United States of America v. BND Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Action Carpet Cleaning, Inc., Gary C. Campbell and BND Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00578
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3720
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Gary C. Campbell with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to Forward". (amf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to BND Enterprises, LLC with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (amf, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gary C. Campbell.(kr, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Illegible, for Action Carpet Cleaning, Inc., served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (alm, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Action Carpet Cleaning, Inc., BND Enterprises, LLC, Gary C. Campbell; mailed CMRRR with #1 Complaint. (kr, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (kr, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Action Carpet Cleaning, Inc., BND Enterprises, LLC, Gary C. Campbell, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. BND Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Carpet Cleaning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary C. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BND Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca M. Saltiel
Represented By: Rebecca Mary Saltiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?