Hanchey v. Enterprise City Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Brent Hanchey
Defendant: Gregory Faught and Enterprise City Board of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv00661
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Marsh, John)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than November 13, 2019, as further set out in order. Additionally, the parties were previously notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and their right to request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. As indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties must confirm their decision to consent to the Magistrate Judge in writing. Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before November 13, 2019. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/16/2019. (kh, )
October 15, 2019 ***Attorney Allison Alford Ingram for Gregory Faught added pursuant to the #12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gregory Faught. (Marsh, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Gregory Faught (kh, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Gregory Faught.(Marsh, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Enterprise City Board of Education. (kh, )
October 7, 2019 ***Attorney Leon Merrill Shirley for Enterprise City Board of Education added pursuant to the #7 answer. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Enterprise City Board of Education. (McKie, Melissa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Enterprise City Board of Education.(McKie, Melissa)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Newsome for Gregory Faught served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (djy, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Newsome for Enterprise City Board of Education served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (djy, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Enterprise City Board of Education, Gregory Faught and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Brent Hanchey (kh, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brent Hanchey. (kh, )
September 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brent Hanchey. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Enterprise City Board of Education, Gregory Faught ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054884.), filed by Brent Hanchey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanchey v. Enterprise City Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Faught
Represented By: John Warren Marsh
Represented By: Allison Alford Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise City Board of Education
Represented By: Melissa Burkett McKie
Represented By: Leon Merrill Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Brent Hanchey
Represented By: Joseph C Guillot
Represented By: Chase Elliot Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?