Baldwin et al v. InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Ray Baldwin and Meshell Baldwin
Defendant: A.M.S. Real Estate Inspection, LLC and InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00676
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #18 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED AS MOOT and the #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; the Defendant shall file their response to the #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by 11/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 11/7/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Reeves, Timothy) Modified on 11/6/2019 to clarify the docket text to reflect as unopposed (wcl, ).
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Reeves, Timothy)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Second Motion to Continue or Suspend Deadlines; Plf shall respond to Dft's #4 Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the Court's ruling on the #9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/18/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Second MOTION to Continue and/or Suspend Deadlines filed by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Reeves, Timothy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 Second MOTION to Continue and/or Suspend Deadlines by Meshell Baldwin, William Ray Baldwin. (Lawson, Richard)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: (1) it is ORDERED that the #13 Motion to Suspend and/or Continue Deadlines is DENIED for failing to comply with the Court's order "to confer in good faith to resolve any disputes, to stipulate to points of agreement, to narrow any remaining issues, and to indicate in the motion whether the motion is opposed; Failure to confer or indicate the same in a motion will be grounds for denial of that motion." (Doc. #7 ); (2) For purposes of the briefing order, Doc. #9 will follow the dispositive motion briefing schedule. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/15/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue and/or Suspend Deadlines by Meshell Baldwin, William Ray Baldwin. (Lawson, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Meshell Baldwin re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Lawson, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Ray Baldwin re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Lawson, Richard)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William Ray Baldwin, Meshell Baldwin; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Meshell Baldwin, William Ray Baldwin. (Lawson, Richard)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has until 10/21/2019 to respond to the #4 motion to dismiss; All other motions will be governed by the #7 standard briefing order. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/7/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/7/2019. (wcl, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Reeves, Timothy) Modified on 10/7/2019 to add the link to the #2 notice (qc/wcl, ).
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Reeves, Timothy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Meshell Baldwin, William Ray Baldwin, & InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (am, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
September 13, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC. (NO PDF attached - See doc #1 ) (am, )
September 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Meshell Baldwin & William Ray Baldwin. (NO PDF attached - See doc #1 ). (am, )
September 13, 2019 COMPLAINT against A.M.S. Real Estate Inspection & LLC, InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC, filed by William Ray Baldwin & Meshell Baldwin. (NO PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 )(am, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC from Circuit Court of Henry County, case number 37-CV-2019-900084.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054915) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Record, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin et al v. InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ray Baldwin
Represented By: Richard Brooke Lawson, III
Represented By: William Allen Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meshell Baldwin
Represented By: Richard Brooke Lawson, III
Represented By: William Allen Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.M.S. Real Estate Inspection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Allen Bottcher
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?