Wright et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Shannon Leann Wright and Raymond Alex Wright
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01064
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/14/2020. (cnw, )
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: DIRECTING the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 2/24/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/14/2020. (cnw, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (am, )
February 3, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER - Attorney Jason Bryon Tingle for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC added. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Lindsey, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(Lindsey, Michael)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Raymond Alex Wright, Shannon Leann Wright. (Bush, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, signed by Julie Buckner for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (amf, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiffs) Raymond Alex Wright, Shannon Leann Wright. (djy, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint and corporate disclosure statement. (djy, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Raymond Alex Wright, Shannon Leann Wright. (djy, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056101.), filed by Raymond Alex Wright, Shannon Leann Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Michael Wesley Lindsey
Represented By: Jason Bryon Tingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Leann Wright
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Alex Wright
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?