Rogers v. Howell et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Jackie Allen Rogers
Defendant: Jeb Howell and City of Dothan Police Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv01071
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Dothan Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that this #13 motion be and is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/18/2020. (kh, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to File exhibit conventionally by Jackie Allen Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-3 CD to Docket entry #8 filed conventionally)(djy, )
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 3/10/2020 the dfts shall file a supplement to their special report which addresses the plf's claims that he was subjected to a false arrest, false imprisonment and malicious prosecution as the charges for which he was arrested by defendant Howell were dismissed on 11/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/13/2020. (wcl, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Dothan Police Department. (White, Freddie)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jeb Howell. (White, Freddie)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jeb Howell, City of Dothan Police Department; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by City of Dothan Police Department, Jeb Howell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit A-12, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Exhibit C)(White, Freddie)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Dothan Police Department, Jeb Howell.(White, Freddie)
February 13, 2020 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for City of Dothan Police Department, Jeb Howell. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #4 Order signed by D.C for City of Dothan Police Department served on 1/10/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (kh, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #4 Order signed by D.C. for Jeb Howell served on 1/9/2020, answer due 2/18/2020.(kh, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before February 18, 2020; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/7/2020. (kh, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/7/2020. (furn: acct clerk, cashier)(kh, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jackie Allen Rogers. (bes, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against City of Dothan Police Department, Jeb Howell, filed by Jackie Allen Rogers.(bes, )
December 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jackie Allen Rogers. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Howell et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeb Howell
Represented By: Freddie Lenton White, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dothan Police Department
Represented By: Freddie Lenton White, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Allen Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?