City of Level Plains, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Level Plains, Alabama
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, PLS and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00137
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Received email from OHND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; OHND case number assigned as 1:20-op-45100. (No pdf attached to this entry)(cnw, )
March 11, 2020 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 3/10/2020 by the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (cnw, ) (cnw, ).
March 9, 2020 Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Daniel Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (kh, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by (illegible) for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (kh, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Paul Sisofo for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (cnw, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by illegible for Actavis, LLC & Cephalon, Inc., served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (cnw, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by M. Wyatt for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (cnw, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #3 Summons signed by illegible for Johnson & Johnson served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (cnw, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc., & TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (cnw, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Noramco, Inc. & Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (cnw, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Strubel, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cnw, ).
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cnw, ).
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, Houston) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cnw, ).
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. & Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (cnw, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by Kelly Webster for McKesson Corporation & Purdue Pharma L.P., served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (cnw, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cnw, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Level Plains, Alabama. (cnw, )
February 25, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Level Plains, Alabama. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056948.), filed by City of Level Plains, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Level Plains, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Houston Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Level Plains, Alabama
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon Eugene Jones
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?