Dean v. Pintoe et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Dedric Jamar Dean
Defendant: Steven Baxely, CO Bradley, CO Pinhoe, Wallace G. Olson, Ronald E. Nelson and CO Pintoe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00494
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #6 Amended Complaint & #7 Order sent to CO Bradley returned with the following USPS notation, " Return to Sender - Attempted - Not Known; Unable to Forward." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION: Considering Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Amend Order as a Motion to Modify; DENYING the #12 Motion to Modify; DENYING Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/21/2020. (am, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend for a Change in #8 Order,construed as a Motion to Modify pursuant to the Court's #13 Order and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dedric Jamar Dean. (dmn, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 (am, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #1 Original Ink Signature Page) (amf, ).
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of #8 Order signed by illegible for Wallace G. Olson, served on 8/10/2020.(am, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #6 Amended Complaint & #7 Order signed by illegible for Ronald E. Nelson & CO Pintoe served on 8/10/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (am, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #6 Amended Complaint & #7 Order signed by illegible for Steven Baxely & Wallace G. Olson served on 8/10/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (am, )
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Sheriff of Dale County, AL, Wallace G. Olson, shall determine if any video recording of the alleged incident exists and, if such recording exists, the Sheriff shall ensure that the recording is preserved for submission to this court; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this order via certified mail to Sheriff Olson. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/6/2020. (Mailed CMRRR to Sheriff Olson, as directed)(am, )
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 9/15/2020, as further set out in Order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with #6 Amended Complaint to Baxely, Bradley, Nelson, Olson, Pintoe. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/6/2020. (am, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Steven Baxely, CO Bradley, Ronald E. Nelson, Wallace G. Olson, CO Pintoe, filed by Dedric Jamar Dean.(cwl, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Upon review of the #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint, the court finds the pleading contains claims that are not related to each other in time or type. It is ORDERED that on or before 8/12/2020, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint as further set out in the order. Plaintiff is advised that this case will proceed only against the defendants named and claims presented in the amended complaint. The amended complaint will, therefore, supercede the original complaint. To aid Plaintiff in filing a response to this order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and Plaintiff shall use this form in filing his amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/29/2020. Copy with 1983 complaint form mailed to Plaintiff as directed.(dmn, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Dale County Jail.It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall immediately inform the court and Defendants or Defendants' counsel of record of any change in his address. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/24/2020. (dmn, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Dedric Jamar Dean. (am, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: DIRECTING that on or before 7/30/2020, Plaintiff shall file either the $400.00 filing/administrative fees or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in Order; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/16/2020. (Mailed w/copy of IFP form, as directed)(am, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Steven Baxely, CO Bradley, Ronald E. Nelson, Wallace G. Olson, CO Pintoe, filed by Dedric Jamar Dean. (No IFP/No Filing Fee). (imm, ) Modified on 7/16/2020 to correct one of the defendant's names(am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Pintoe et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Baxely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Pinhoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace G. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Pintoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedric Jamar Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?