Bradham v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Ervin Bradham
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00604
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C Billingslea on behalf of United States of America (Billingslea, Stephanie)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION: Upon consideration of Petitioners motion for extension of time (Doc. No. #8 ), it is ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is furtherORDERED that Petitioner is GRANTED an extension from September 21, 2020, to and including October 21, 2020, to file a reply to the Governments response to the 2255 motion.Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/2/2020. (dmn, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by United States of America. (Ivy, Curtis)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Ivy, Jr on behalf of United States of America (Ivy, Curtis)
August 31, 2020 *** PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #5 & #6 ORDERS - Attorneys Bradley G Bodiford and Kevin P Davidson terminated. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING the #4 Motion to Withdraw Kevin P. Davidson as Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/31/2020. (am, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING the #3 Motion to Withdraw Bradley G. Bodiford as Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/31/2020. (am, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Kevin P. Davidson to Withdraw as Counsel by United States of America. (Davidson, Kevin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Bradley G. Bodiford to Withdraw as Counsel by United States of America. (Bodiford, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing CLERK to serve a copy of Bradham's #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) upon the US Attorney; directing the US Attorney to file a response to Bradham's 2255 motion on or before 9/21/2020 as further set out in the order. The CLERK is DIRECTED to provide a copy of the 2255 motion to attorney Jon Carlton Taylor. It is further ORDERED that on or before 9/11/2020, Mr. Taylor shall file with this court an affidavit that addresses all claims of ineffective assistance of counsel presented against him in the 2255 motion. Mr. Taylor shall also furnish the US Attorney and Mr. Bradham with copies of his affidavit. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 8/20/2020. Copy with #1 Motion furnished to US Attorney, and attorney Jon Carlton Taylor as directed. (dmn, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Ervin Bradham. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documents (Memo), #2 Criminal Judgment, #3 Criminal Docket Sheet)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradham v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Bradham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Bradley G Bodiford
Represented By: Kevin P Davidson
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Represented By: Brett J. Talley
Represented By: Stephanie C Billingslea
Represented By: Curtis Ivy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?