Crosby v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Douglas H. Crosby
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Petitioner: Samantha Rudolph
Case Number: 1:2020cv00729
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of Plaintiff's #16 Motion to Remand filed by Douglas H. Crosby. (Morris, Joseph) Modified on 11/3/2020 to reflect actual title. (dmn, )
October 27, 2020 Objection to #12 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #20 for PDF) (amf, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE and Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand, and, OBJECTION to #12 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 10/27/2020 to clarify the docket text (amf, ).
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Douglas H. Crosby; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that on or before 10/27/2020, the Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE why the Plaintiff's #16 Motion to Remand should not be granted. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff may file a reply to the Defendants' response on or before 11/3/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/20/2020. (dmn, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Douglas H. Crosby; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Douglas H. Crosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Return - Rudolph, #2 Exhibit Service Return - Walmart, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Claims Report redacted)(Morris, Joseph)
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #14 Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas on Non-Parties. The referenced document is discovery and is not allowed pursuant to LR 26.3 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY. The document is hereby STRICKEN from the record and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry of this document on the court docket. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 26.3 Non-Filing of Civil Discovery)(dmn, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 [STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. THIS DOCUMENT IS DISCOVERY AND IS NOT ALLOWED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26.3 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY.] NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP of Intent to Serve Subpoenas on Non Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A NPS BCBS of AL, #2 Exhibit B NPS Dothan Anesthesiology, #3 Exhibit C NPS Wiregrass VA Clinic, #4 Exhibit D NPS Birmingham VA Medical Center)(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 10/8/2020. (dmn, )
October 2, 2020 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Douglas H. Crosby. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #12 for pdf)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Now pending before the court is Defendants' motion to correct Exhibit A (doc. #8 ) filed on September 20, 2020. Upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion to correct (doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to substitute and replace Exhibit A (doc #1 -2) attached to the Notice of Removal with Exhibit 1 (doc. #8 -1) attached to the motion to correct. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/2/2020. (dmn, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Douglas H. Crosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim Form, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Morris, Joseph) Modified on 10/5/2020 to reflect actual title. (dmn, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP re #9 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 10/9/2020 to add the link to the #9 notice (amf, ).
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Samantha Rudolph; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend Exhibit A re #1 Notice of Removal by Samantha Rudolph, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court File)(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 10/1/2020 to add the link to the #1 Notice (amf, ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
September 28, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Adams: #2 MOTION to Dismiss. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Before the court is a Motion to Dismiss Defendant Samantha Rudolph (Doc. No. #2 ) filed by a party which the Clerk of Court has listed as a movant. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 10/5/2020, the plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why the motion to dismiss should not be granted. The movant shall file a reply on or about 10/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/22/2020. (dmn, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The parties in this case have been notified that this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge. (Doc. No. #3 .) Each party has the right to consent or request reassignment of this matter to a district judge. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties should not make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment. The parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/29/2020 as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/22/2020. (dmn, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East, LP & Samantha Rudolph; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES. (amf, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Samantha Rudolph filed by Samantha Rudolph. (amf, )
September 11, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Douglas H. Crosby. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF) (amf, )
September 11, 2020 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Douglas H. Crosby. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Houston County, AL, case number 38-CV-2020-900220.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602059401) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) Modified on 9/18/2020 to remove Samantha Rudolph as a filer (amf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosby v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Mignon Mestayer DeLashmet
Represented By: Wilbur Pemble DeLashmet
Represented By: Chad Christopher Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas H. Crosby
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samantha Rudolph
Represented By: Mignon Mestayer DeLashmet
Represented By: Wilbur Pemble DeLashmet
Represented By: Chad Christopher Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?