Peters v. Elsheikh et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Randall Peters
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company and Deena Elsheikh
Case Number: 1:2020cv00749
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge & Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mudd, William)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES, Deena Elsheikh, GEICO General Insurance Company, Curtis Randall Peters. (dmn, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William Anderson Mudd on behalf of Deena Elsheikh (Mudd, William)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Geico Indemnity Company, incorrectly identified in Complaint as GEICO General Insurance Company. (Nichols, William) Modified on 9/29/2020 to include proper defendant name as noted in pdf. (dmn, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2020: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (dmn, ). Modified on 9/30/2020 to include certificate of service with signature. (dmn, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Curtis Randall Peters. (Parker, Adam)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2020; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/26/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/28/2020. (amf, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Deena Elsheikh. (dmn, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Deena Elsheikh.(dmn, )
September 17, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company.(dmn, ) (no pdf, see Answer filed as attachment Doc. #1 ) Modified on 9/25/2020 to remove jury demand, docketing error. (dmn, )
September 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Curtis Randall Peters. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see State Court Complaint, Doc. #1 )
September 17, 2020 COMPLAINT against Deena Elsheikh, GEICO General Insurance Company, filed by Curtis Randall Peters.(dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 )
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deena Elsheikh from Circuit Court of Houston County, Alabama, case number 38-CV-20-900369.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059486) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Geico Consent for Diversity Jurisdiction Removal, #2 Exhibit B, State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C, AL Uniform Traffic Crash Report, #4 Exhibit D, Affidavit of Deena Elsheikh, #5 Exhibit E, Correspondence, #6 State Court Complaint, #7 Answer by Geico Indemnity Company, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Elsheikh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: William Wayne Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deena Elsheikh
Represented By: Kerry Phillip Luke
Represented By: William Anderson Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Randall Peters
Represented By: Adam Eugene Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?