Ivey et al v. Danner et al
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Ivey and Amanda Sanders
Defendant: Breland Danner and Sabra Branch
Case Number: 1:2020cv00846
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that on or before November 16, 2020, the plaintiffs shall show cause in writing why the #8 motion to dismiss filed by the defendant should not be granted. The defendant shall file a reply on or before November 23, 2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/23/2020. (kh, )
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment. The parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before November 9, 2020. Note: CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/23/2020. (kh, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES - Sabra Branch, Breland Danner, Kaitlin Ivey, Amanda Sanders. (wcl, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sabra Branch. (wcl, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Breland Danner. (wcl, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Sabra Branch, Breland Danner. (wcl, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Janet Dobbs on behalf of Sabra Branch, Breland Danner. (wcl, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Scott Schlenker on behalf of Sabra Branch, Breland Danner. (wcl, )
October 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kaitlin Ivey, Amanda Sanders. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
October 16, 2020 COMPLAINT against Sabra Branch, Breland Danner, filed by Kaitlin Ivey, Amanda Sanders. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf)(wcl, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sabra Branch, Breland Danner from Circuit Court of Dale County, Alabama, case number 26-CV-20-900111.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059883) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt)(wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivey et al v. Danner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlin Ivey
Represented By: Troy Robin King
Represented By: Horace Earl Nix, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Sanders
Represented By: Troy Robin King
Represented By: Horace Earl Nix, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breland Danner
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Schlenker
Represented By: Kimberly Janet Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabra Branch
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Schlenker
Represented By: Kimberly Janet Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?