Daniels v. Farm Service Agency et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Daniels
Defendant: Farm Service Agency and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 1:2020cv00939
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and corporate disclosure signed by B. F. (name illegible) for Farm Service Agency served on 11/23/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (dmn, )
December 1, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline due to erroneously set with incorrect date when originally docketed (Doc. #5 ): United States Department of Agriculture Answer due 1/23/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, conflict statement signed by Emily Sase for Attorney General, served 11/23/2020. (dmn, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, complaint, and conflict statement signed by Lawrence Beamon for United States Attorney, served on 11/24/2020, United States Department of Agriculture answer due 1/23/2021. (dmn, ) Modified on 12/1/2020 to correct answer deadline. (dmn, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (wcl, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Harvey Daniels. (dmn, )
November 19, 2020 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Harvey Daniels. (dmn, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE ACTION, HEARING DE NOVO AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602060245.), filed by Harvey Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Farm Service Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Daniels
Represented By: George L. Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?