Bowman v. Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Clayton Bowman
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A., Yamaha Motor Company, Ltd. and Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00088
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 33 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Yamaha Motor Company, Ltd.. (Strubel, John)
June 2, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #31 ANSWER - Attorney Houston Lanier Brown, II for Defendant Yamaha Motor Company, Ltd. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS AND MATERIALS: it is ORDERED that the #30 Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding the Confidentiality of Documents and Materials is GRANTED, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 6/2/2021. (cwl, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Yamaha Motor Company, Ltd..(Strubel, John)
June 1, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Entry of Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding the Confidentiality of Documents and Materials by Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America. (Strubel, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks: Motion Hearing by Telephone held on 5/26/2021 re #19 MOTION to Extend Time to Perfect Service on Foreign Defendant filed by Clayton Bowman (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Katie Sears Silas.) (ws, )
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #19 Motion to Extend Time to Perfect Service on Foreign Defendant is GRANTED to the extent that it is extended for sixty days; The Defendants shall have until 7/26/2021 to perfect service on Yamaha Motor Company, Ltd. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/26/2021. (amf, )
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Entry of Qualified HIPAA Protective Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/25/2021. (amf, )
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the defendants' #25 Motion for Entry of Qualified HIPAA Protective Order filed on 5/10/2021; Accordingly, it is ORDERED that on or before 5/21/2021, the plaintiff shall show cause in writing as to why the #25 motion for protective order filed by the defendants should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/11/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry)(amf, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Qualified HIPAA Protective Order by Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A.. (Strubel, John)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #19 Motion to Extend Time to Perfect Service on Foreign Defendant; it is ORDERED that that this matter is set for a status and scheduling conference on 5/26/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone conference call; DIRECTING the parties to contact Courtroom Deputy Wanda Stinson for the phone number and access code required to participate in the conference call. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/6/2021. (Furnished: Calendar & WS) (amf, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Extend Time to Perfect Service on Foreign Defendant filed by Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America. (Brown, Houston)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/28/2021. (amf, )
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/12/2021, the Defendants shall show cause why the #19 motion to extend time to perfect service on foreign defendant should not be granted; further ORDERED that the Plaintiff may file a reply to the Defendant's response on or before 5/19/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/28/2021. (amf, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time re #18 Uniform Scheduling Order by Clayton Bowman. (Fulk, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Time to Perfect Service on Foreign Defendant by Clayton Bowman. (Fulk, Joseph)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2022, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 2A, before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Jury Selection & Trial set for 10/3/2022, at 10:00 AM, in Dothan, AL, before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Amended Pleadings due by 6/29/2021; Discovery due by 3/7/2022; Mediation Notice due by 3/12/2022; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 4/6/2022; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/13/2021. (Furnished: Calendar & WS) (amf, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fulk, Joseph)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/5/2021. (amf, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; DIRECTING the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 4/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/5/2021. (amf, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Brown, Houston)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A. & Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendants Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A. & Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America. (amf, )
March 2, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 & #10 ANSWERS - Attorney John Patrick Strubel for Defendants Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A. & Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America.(Brown, Houston)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A..(Brown, Houston)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clayton Bowman; Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Fulk, Joseph)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clayton Bowman; Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Fulk, Joseph)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Clayton Bowman re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Fulk, Joseph)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Yamaha Motor Company, Ltd. to counsel for service pursuant to Hague Convention. (am, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Clayton Bowman; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Clayton Bowman. (amf, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yamaha Motor Company, Ltd., Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A., Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602061063), filed by Clayton Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Restricted, Privacy Issue), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
January 29, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clayton Bowman. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation U.S.A.
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Houston Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Houston Lanier Brown, II
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Houston Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Bowman
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Fulk
Represented By: Dennis Eugene Goldasich
Represented By: Justin Craddock Owen
Represented By: Justin Craddock Owen,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?