Barrentine et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Allen R. Barrentine and Chad Barrentine
Defendant: Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00158
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by (No Signature) for U.S. Attorney General, served on 3/8/2021. (amf, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chad Barrentine re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Beck, George)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Allen R. Barrentine re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Beck, George)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Illegible for Farm Service Agency, served on 3/1/2021. (amf, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Lawrence Beamon for U.S. Attorney's Office, served on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021 for United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture & Farm Service Agency. (amf, ) Modified on 3/3/2021 to include Defendant Farm Service Agency (amf, ).
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Petition. (cwl, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Chad Barrentine; Allen R. Barrentine, Corporate Disclosures due by 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Formet)(cwl, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Allen R. Barrentine, Chad Barrentine. (cwl, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE ACTION, AND HEARING DE NOVO against Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602062003.), filed by Chad Barrentine, Allen R. Barrentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 receipt)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrentine et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen R. Barrentine
Represented By: George L. Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Barrentine
Represented By: George L. Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?