Clements v. All In Pizza, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Clements
Defendant: All In Pizza, LLC, Lightning Pizza, LLC and Jerry Longen
Case Number: 1:2021cv00510
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Consent Motion for a Second Extension (Doc. #16 ) is GRANTED. The Defendants shall file their responses on or by 10/20/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/21/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by All In Pizza, LLC, Lightning Pizza, LLC, Jerry Longen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harold, Edward)
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lightning Pizza, LLC. (Harold, Edward) Modified on 9/10/2021 to remove All In Pizza, LLC & Jerry Longen as filers & to clarify text (cwl, ).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing that on or before 9/10/2021, Lightning Pizza, LLC shall file an amended Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement, identifying by name all members that comprise 2 Monkeys Holdings, LLC, Thunder Pizza, LLC, and BS End Game, LLC. If one or more of those members are also LLCs or partnerships, Lightning Pizza, LLC shall identify those members or partners as well, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/3/2021. (djy, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jerry Longen. (Harold, Edward) Modified on 9/1/2021 to clarify as satisfying #9 deficiency notice (cwl, ).
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lightning Pizza, LLC. (Harold, Edward) Modified on 9/1/2021 to clarify as satisfying #9 deficiency notice (cwl, ).
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by All In Pizza, LLC. (Harold, Edward) Modified on 9/1/2021 to clarify as satisfying #9 deficiency notice) (cwl, ).
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Consent Motion for an Extension (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading to the Complaint on or by 9/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 8/23/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to All In Pizza, LLC, Lightning Pizza, LLC, Jerry Longen. Corporate Disclosures due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by All In Pizza, LLC, Lightning Pizza, LLC, Jerry Longen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harold, Edward)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bobby Clements. (Hughes, David) Modified on 8/16/2021 to clarify as satisfying #2 deficiency notice (cwl, ).
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by illegible for Jerry Longen served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (cwl, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by illegible for All In Pizza, LLC served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (cwl, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by C. Henderson for Lightning Pizza, LLC served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (cwl, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All In Pizza, LLC, Lightning Pizza, LLC, Jerry Longen; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 complaint. (bes, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bobby Clements; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All In Pizza, LLC, Lightning Pizza, LLC, Jerry Longen ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064152.), filed by Bobby Clements. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Request for Service via CMRRR, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(bes, )
August 2, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bobby Clements. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements v. All In Pizza, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Clements
Represented By: David Alan Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All In Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightning Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Longen
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?