Harris v. The City of Ozark, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Carl Harris, Jr.
Defendant: The City of Ozark, Alabama, Marlos Walker, Jimmy Culbreath and J. C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00553
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORRECTED TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the #15 Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the #15 Motion is GRANTED; Plaintiff may file a response in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before 11/12/2021; Defendants' deadline to file a reply is extended to 11/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/14/2021. (NO PDF attached to this entry)(am, )
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the #15 Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file a response in opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before 11/12/2021. Defendants deadline to file a reply is extended to 1/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/13/2021. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).(djy, )
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Order to Show Cause by Carl Harris, Jr. (Harrison, David)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, by the PLF if any there be, as to why the #11 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 10/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/8/2021. (bes, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide consent or request reassignment must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk by 10/29/2021, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/8/2021. (bes, )
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jimmy Culbreath, The City of Ozark, Alabama, Marlos Walker. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, Declaration of Denise Strickland, #2 Ex. 2, Putative Notice of Claim)(Pike, James) Modified on 10/8/2021 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Jimmy Culbreath, The City of Ozark, Alabama, Marlos Walker. (Pike, James) Modified on 10/8/2021 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the #8 Consent Motion to Extend Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants may respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 10/11/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/13/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Culbreath, The City of Ozark, Alabama, Marlos Walker. (Pike, James)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jimmy Culbreath, The City of Ozark, Alabama, Marlos Walker. (Pike, James)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by E. Stokes for The City of Ozark, Alabama served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (bes, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by E. Stokes for Marlos Walker served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (bes, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for Jimmy Culbreath served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (bes, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jimmy Culbreath, The City of Ozark, Alabama, Marlos Walker; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cwl, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Carl Harris, Jr. (dmn, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Carl Harris, Jr. (dmn, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jimmy Culbreath, The City of Ozark, Alabama, Marlos Walker ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064413.), filed by Carl Harris, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carl Harris, Jr. (dmn, ) (no pdf see Doc. #1 for pdf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. The City of Ozark, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Harris, Jr.
Represented By: David Jerome Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Ozark, Alabama
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlos Walker
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Culbreath
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C.
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?