Reynolds v. Calhoun, et al
Plaintiff: Cazeio Reynolds
Defendant: Will Maddox, Travis Calhoun, Jonathan Elkins, Brandon Chase Pynes and Damon Woodall
Case Number: 1:2021cv00649
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cazeio Reynolds. (NO PDF - See doc #12 ) (am, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT pursuant to FRCP R. 15 against Travis Calhoun, Jonathan Elkins, Brandon Chase Pynes, Damon Woodall, filed by Cazeio Reynolds.(Fonteneau, Kira)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Now pending before the Court is the Defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. #9 ) filed on 11/8/2021. Upon consideration of the motion and request, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that on or before 11/22/2021, the Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why the motion and request should not be granted. It is further ORDERED that the Defendants may file a reply to the Plaintiff's response on or before 11/29/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/8/2021. (dmn, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Travis Calhoun, Jonathan Elkins, Will Maddox, Brandon Chase Pynes, Damon Woodall. (Hill, Charles)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Travis Calhoun, Jonathan Elkins, Will Maddox, Brandon Chase Pynes, Damon Woodall. (Hill, Charles)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Summons signed by Jonathan Elkins for Jonathan Elkins served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (dmn, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Summons signed by Damon Woodall for Damon Woodall served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (dmn, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Summons signed by Brandon Pynes for Brandon Chase Pynes served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (dmn, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Summons signed by Will Maddox for Will Maddox served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (dmn, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Summons signed by Travis Calhoun for Travis Calhoun served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (dmn, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Travis Calhoun, Jonathan Elkins, Will Maddox, Brandon Chase Pynes, Damon Woodall and mailed CMRRR with #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (es, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Cazeio Reynolds. (djy, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travis Calhoun, Jonathan Elkins, Will Maddox, Brandon Chase Pynes, Damon Woodall ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064790.), filed by Cazeio Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 request for service by certified mail, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, )
September 30, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cazeio Reynolds. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Calhoun, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cazeio Reynolds
Represented By: Kira Yalon Fonteneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Maddox
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Calhoun
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Elkins
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Chase Pynes
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Woodall
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?