Ingram et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Ingram, Dawn Ingram and Charles Kenneth Ingram
Defendant: United States of America, Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture and Tom Vilsack
Case Number: 1:2021cv00720
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #9 Alias Summons signed by Patrice Pettus for Tom Vilsack on 11/29/2021. (cwl, )
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #11 ), it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant may file a responsive pleading on or before March 7, 2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/21/2021. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEFS) Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack. (cwl, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack. (Bowdre, Marylou)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack. (Bowdre, Marylou)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Summons signed by Lawrence B. for United States Department of Agriculture served on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (cwl, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 Alias Summons issued as to Tom Vilsack and mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Cards showing service of #1 Complaint & #7 Summons signed by Lawrence B. for Farm Service Agency; United States of America; Tom Vilsack served on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (cwl, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America & Tom Vilsack all c/o U.S. Attorney; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cwl, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles Kenneth Ingram re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (McGowan, Stephen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dawn Ingram re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (McGowan, Stephen)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ashley Ingram re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (McGowan, Stephen)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ashley Ingram, Dawn Ingram, Charles Kenneth Ingram. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLFS) Ashley Ingram, Charles Kenneth Ingram, Dawn Ingram. (cwl, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Judicial Review, Hearing De Novo and Equitable Relief against Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602065051.), filed by Ashley Ingram, Charles Kenneth Ingram, Dawn Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 receipt)(cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2021: #5 Civil Cover Sheet Correct) (cwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Ingram
Represented By: Stephen Glenn McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Ingram
Represented By: Stephen Glenn McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kenneth Ingram
Represented By: Stephen Glenn McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?