Culver v. Smoak et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Gary Culver
Defendant: Jason Smoak, Spencer Downs, James Brazier, Mark Trawick, Sharon King and Stephanie Fears
Case Number: 1:2021cv00729
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #12 Order mailed to Gary Culver at Houston County Jail returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Correction re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer re #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint. The original pdf contained an incorrect case number. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of #13 Motion)(dmn, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON MOTION: Upon consideration of Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, and in light of the Order entered 12/1/2021, that directed the filing of Answer and Written Report to the Complaint be held in ABEYANCE (see Doc. #11 ), it is ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #13 ) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/20/2021. (dmn, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer re #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint by James Brazier, Spencer Downs, Stephanie Fears, Sharon King, Jason Smoak, Mark Trawick. (Hill, Charles) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/20/2021) (dmn, ). (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/20/2021) (dmn, ). Modified on 12/20/2021 due to case number incorrect on pdf. (dmn, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Attorney Ashley Hawkins Freeman added for James Brazier, Spencer Downs, Stephanie Fears, Sharon King, Jason Smoak, Mark Trawick. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #13 )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/17/2021. (dmn, )
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #11 Order mailed to Gary Culver at Houston County Jail returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of the #11 Order sent to Gary Culver was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Not At This Address, Return To Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward." (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff filed this action on 11/1/2021, while he was incarcerated at the Houston County Jail in Dothan, AL. On 11/8/2021, the Court entered Orders (Docs. #3 , #4 ), copies of which the Clerk mailed to Plaintiff. The postal service returned these documents on 11/29/2021, marked as undeliverable. The administration of this case cannot proceed if the whereabouts of Plaintiff remain unknown. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that by 12/13/2021, Plaintiff must file with the Court a current address or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to adequately prosecute this action. Plaintiff is informed that if he fails to respond to this Order the Magistrate Judge will recommend this case be dismissed. It is further ORDERED that the directive requiring Defendants to file an Answer and Written Report to the Complaint be held in ABEYANCE pending Plaintiff's compliance with this Order. The CLERK is hereby DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his last known mailing address and to Defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/1/2021. (dmn, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #3 Order and #4 Order mailed to Gary Culver returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Undeliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward, Not at this Address." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #3 Order mailed to Account Clerk at Houston County Jail returned by Account Clerk at Houston City Jail with note, "Inmate Released from jail 11/3/2021." (dmn, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by name illegible for Mark Trawick served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (dmn, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by name illegible for Jason Smoak served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (dmn, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by name illegible for Sharon King served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (dmn, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by name illegible for Stephanie Fears served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (dmn, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by name illegible for Spencer Downs served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (dmn, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by name illegible for James Brazier served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (dmn, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT on or before 12/20/2021 as further set out in the order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to individuals named as defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/8/2021. (dmn, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full as further set out in the order; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Houston County Jail.Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/8/2021. (dmn, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Gary Culver. (hrs, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against James Brazier, Spencer Downs, Stephanie Fears, Sharon King, Jason Smoak, Mark Trawick, filed by Gary Culver.(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culver v. Smoak et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smoak
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Downs
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brazier
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Trawick
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon King
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Fears
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?