Crain et al v. Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Davis Crain and Carol Crain
Defendant: Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc. and Kevin Allan Millender
Case Number: 1:2022cv00033
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Richardson, Blake)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Carol Crain, Charles Davis Crain; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Trey Canida on behalf of Carol Crain, Charles Davis Crain (Canida, Nicolas)
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral judge; Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, )
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/17/2022; Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk by 3/17/2022; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 2/24/2022. (bes, )
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin Allan Millender.(Rogers, Jannea)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc..(Rogers, Jannea)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Ryan Dardard on behalf of Kevin Allan Millender, Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc. (Dardard, Kevin)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kevin Allan Millender re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Rogers, Jannea)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc. re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Rogers, Jannea)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc. & Kevin Allan Millender; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Carol Crain, Charles Davis Crain, Kevin Allan Millender, Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc.. (bes, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kevin Allan Millender, Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc. from Circuit Court of Houston County, AL, case number 38-cv-21-900502.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602065718) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Receipt)(bes, )
January 19, 2022 COMPLAINT against Kevin Allan Millender, Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc., filed by Charles Davis Crain, Carol Crain. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -1 for PDF)(bes, )
January 19, 2022 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court by Kevin Allan Millender, Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -5 for PDF) (bes, )
January 19, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carol Crain, Charles Davis Crain. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -1 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crain et al v. Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Davis Crain
Represented By: Patrick Glenn Montgomery
Represented By: Nicolas Trey Canida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Crain
Represented By: Patrick Glenn Montgomery
Represented By: Nicolas Trey Canida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Farms Colorado, Inc.
Represented By: Jannea Suzanne Rogers
Represented By: Kevin Ryan Dardard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Allan Millender
Represented By: Jannea Suzanne Rogers
Represented By: Kevin Ryan Dardard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?