Price v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Lee E. Price, III
Defendant: Houston County Jail, Donald Valenza, James Brazier and Chaplain Pickett
Case Number: 1:2022cv00360
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT: DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 7/26/2022. (es, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2022: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (es, ). Modified on 7/26/2022 to add appeals checklist. (es, ).
July 25, 2022 NOTICE of Dismissal, as consider by Court's #15 Order and Final Judgment. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc. #14 ) by Lee E. Price, III. (es, )
July 25, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Lee E. Price, III. (cwl, )
July 18, 2022 Filing 13 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) This case be ALLOWED TO PROCEED on Plaintiff's First Amendment, Fourteenth Amendment, and RLUIPA claims for nominal and punitive damages. 2) Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief be DISMISSED AS MOOT. 3) Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction be DENIED AS MOOT. 4) Plaintiff's claim for compensatory damages be DISMISSED. 5) Houston County Jail be DISMISSED as a Defendant. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/18/2022. (cwl, )
July 14, 2022 Filing 12 Received Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 3.70, receipt number 4602067321. (cwl, ) Modified on 7/15/2022 to correct the filing date (cwl, ).
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chaplain Pickett. (Hill, Charles)
July 5, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donald Valenza. (Hill, Charles)
July 5, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Houston County Jail. (Hill, Charles)
July 5, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Brazier. (Hill, Charles)
July 5, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order to Show Cause,, filed by James Brazier, Houston County Jail, Chaplain Pickett, Donald Valenza. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Brazier)(Hill, Charles) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/5/2022 to correct the case number) (cwl, ).
July 5, 2022 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for James Brazier, Houston County Jail, Chaplain Pickett, Donald Valenza. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
July 5, 2022 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 RESPONSE - Attorney Charles Richard Hill, Jr, Ashley Hawkins Freeman for James Brazier, Houston County Jail, Chaplain Pickett, Donald Valenza added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint, #4 Order to Show Cause, signed by A. Richards for Sheriff Donald Valenza, served on 6/16/2022. (cwl, )
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #4 Order to Show Cause, signed by C-19 for Charles Richard Hill, Jr., Capell & Howard, P.C., served on 6/15/2022. (cwl, )
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 7/5/2022, Defendant Sheriff Valenza must show cause why this Court should not order preliminary injunctive relief in response to Plaintiff's claims. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and a copy of this Order, the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), any attachments to it, to Defendant Sheriff Valenza by CMRRR. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to send a courtesy copy of this Order to Charles Richard Hill, Jr., Capell & Howard, P.C. Post Office Box 2069, Montgomery, AL 36102-2069, by CMRRR. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/14/2022. (docs mailed as directed)(cwl, )
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 6/14/2022. (furn: cashier) (cwl, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Lee E. Price, III. (hrs, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/13/2022 to correct the case # on PDF) (cwl, ).
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against James Brazier, Houston County Jail, Chaplain Pickett, Donald Valenza, filed by Lee E. Price, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum of Law)(hrs, )
June 13, 2022 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lee E. Price, III.(No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee E. Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Jail
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Valenza
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brazier
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Pickett
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?