Heath v. Southern Hospitality Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christine Heath
Defendant: Southern Hospitality Group, LLC, MY Hospitality Services, LLC, Yogesh Patel, Suresh Patel, Minesh Patel, Mike Sorona, BV Patel and Holiday Inn Covington, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00327
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by MY Hospitality Services, LLC. (Sherman, Colin)
June 28, 2023 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Holiday Inn Covington, LLC, BV Patel, Minesh Patel, Suresh Patel, Yogesh Patel, Mike Sorona. (Sherman, Colin)
June 14, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 - 6 MOTION to Quash and MOTION to Dismiss, #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christine Heath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kirby, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2023 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #7 Exhibit A (Redacted), #8 Exhibit B (Redacted), #9 Exhibit D (Redacted)) (amf, ). Modified on 6/15/2023 (amf, ).
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by MY Hospitality Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Sherman, Colin)
June 7, 2023 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MY Hospitality Services, LLC. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #12 -1 for PDF) (bes, )
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Motion for Extension (Doc. #10 ) is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant MY Hospitality Services, LLC to respond to the Complaint is extended to 6/8/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/25/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
May 25, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MY Hospitality Services, LLC. (Sherman, Colin) Modified on 5/25/2023 to clarify event type and text (bes, ).
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by MY Hospitality Services, LLC re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sherman, Colin) Modified on 5/25/2023 to add link (bes, ).
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to the Defendants Motions to Quash and Motions to Dismiss on or by 6/14/2023, and Defendants shall file their reply on or by 6/28/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/24/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER setting out further briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/24/2023. (bes, )
May 22, 2023 Filing 6 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan as Referral Judge. Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (bes, )
May 22, 2023 Motions No Longer Referred: MOTION to Quash MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Quash MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Quash MOTION to Dismiss (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: each of the parties is hereby DIRECTED to complete and return the appropriate form so that it is received by the Clerk of Court on or before 6/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 5/17/2023. (amf, )
May 17, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Holiday Inn Covington, LLC, BV Patel, Minesh Patel, Suresh Patel, Yogesh Patel, Mike Sorona, Southern Hospitality Group, LLC, MY Hospitality Services, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
May 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Christine Heath, Holiday Inn Covington, LLC, MY Hospitality Services, LLC, BV Patel, Minesh Patel, Suresh Patel, Yogesh Patel, Mike Sorona, Southern Hospitality Group, LLC. (bes, )
May 17, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan as Presiding Judge. (bes, )
May 16, 2023 Special Appearance to Quash Defective Process and Service of Process and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Holiday Inn Covington, LLC. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -6 at page 53 for PDF) (bes, )
May 16, 2023 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against BV Patel, Minesh Patel, Suresh Patel, Yogesh Patel, Mike Sorona, Southern Hospitality Group, LLC, filed by Christine Heath. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -2 for PDF)(bes, )
May 16, 2023 First Amended Special Appearance to Quash Defective Process and Service of Process and MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jursdiction by Holiday Inn Covington, LLC, BV Patel, Minesh Patel, Suresh Patel, Yogesh Patel, Mike Sorona. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -6 at page 100 for PDF) (bes, )
May 16, 2023 Special Appearance NOTICE of Filing of #1 Notice of Removal by MY Hospitality Services, LLC. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -7 for PDF) (bes, )
May 16, 2023 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Holiday Inn Covington, LLC, MY Hospitality Services, LLC, BV Patel, Minesh Patel, Suresh Patel, Yogesh Patel, Mike Sorona, Southern Hospitality Group, LLC, filed by Christine Heath. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -3 for PDF)(bes, )
May 16, 2023 Second Amended Special Appearance to Quash Defective Process and Service of Process and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Holiday Inn Covington, LLC, BV Patel, Minesh Patel, Suresh Patel, Yogesh Patel, Mike Sorona. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -6 at page 225 for PDF) (bes, )
May 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MY Hospitality Services, LLC from Circuit Court of Houston County, case number 38-CV-2022-900228.00. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3435632) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A -St Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - St Court First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Record, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing Removal, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(Sherman, Colin) Modified on 5/16/2023 to clarify text (bes, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/17/2023) (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heath v. Southern Hospitality Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Heath
Represented By: Chandler Osborn Kirby
Represented By: Robert Aaron Gartlan
Represented By: Jeffrey Conett Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Hospitality Group, LLC
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MY Hospitality Services, LLC
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yogesh Patel
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suresh Patel
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minesh Patel
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Sorona
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BV Patel
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Inn Covington, LLC
Represented By: Colin Derrick Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?