Jenkins et al v. Hako-Med Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Jenkins and Donna Cowen
Defendant: Hako-Med Holdings, Inc., Hako-Med USA, Inc. and Hako-Med Herstellung + Vertrieb von medizinisch-technischen Geraten GmbH
Case Number: 1:2023cv00515
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: A telephone hearing regarding the Motion to Remand (Doc. #10 ) is SET for 11/8/2023 at 10:00 AM. The Courtroom Deputy will contact counsel with the call-in information. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 10/25/2023. (furn: Calendar, ww, dh, lw) (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
October 25, 2023 Filing 18 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge. Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (bes, )
October 10, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hako-Med Holdings, Inc.. (McClendon, Brian)
October 4, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donna Cowen re #14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Crum, Richard)
October 4, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nancy Jenkins re #14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Crum, Richard)
October 4, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiffs Nancy Jenkins & Donna Cowen; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(amf, )
October 3, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Donna Cowen, Nancy Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Crum, Richard)
October 3, 2023 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Hako-Med Holdings, Inc., Hako-Med USA, Inc., Hako-Med Herstellung + Vertrieb von medizinisch-technischen Geraten GmbH, filed by Nancy Jenkins, Donna Cowen.(Crum, Richard) Modified on 10/4/2023 to include jury demand, to remove as filed against "all defendants", & to list them individually (amf, ).
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: For good cause it is ORDERED that on or before October 16, 2023, the defendant shall show cause in writing as to why the plaintiffs' motion to remand (Doc. No. #10 ) should not be granted. The plaintiffs shall file a reply on or before October 23, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/2/2023. (no pdf attached)(cwl, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donna Cowen, Nancy Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Crum, Richard)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment. The parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/10/2023. Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/19/2023. (bes, )
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, by the PLF in writing, as to why the #7 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted; PLFs' Show Cause Response due by 10/3/2023; The dft shall file a reply on or before 10/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/19/2023. (bes, )
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hako-Med Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McClendon, Brian)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant Hako-Med Holdings, Inc's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. No. #5 ), and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The defendant, Hako-Med Holdings, Inc., shall file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before September 19, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/6/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, )
September 5, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Hako-Med Holdings, Inc. (McClendon, Brian) Modified on 9/5/2023 to correct motion event (cwl, ).
August 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLFS & 1 DEF) Donna Cowen, Hako-Med Holdings, Inc., Nancy Jenkins (cwl, )
August 30, 2023 Filing 3 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams. (cwl, )
August 29, 2023 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Hako-Med Holdings, Inc., Hako-Med USA, Inc., filed by Nancy Jenkins, Donna Cowen. (no pdf attached - see doc #1 -1 for pdf)(cwl, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hako-Med Holdings, Inc.. (McClendon, Brian) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/30/2023 to correct the division in the case number) (cwl, ).
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Houston County, Alabama, case number 38-cv-23-900291 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3496503) , filed by Hako-Med Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, Service Return, #3 Exhibit 3, Affidavit of Kai Hansjurgens, #4 Exhibit 4, Dissolution Documents of Hako-Med USA, #5 Exhibit 5, SJIS, #6 Exhibit 6, State Court Filings)(McClendon, Brian) Modified on 8/30/2023 to add other court information (cwl, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/30/2023 to correct the division in the case number) (cwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins et al v. Hako-Med Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Jenkins
Represented By: Kelly Wayne Harmon
Represented By: Richard Elder Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Cowen
Represented By: Kelly Wayne Harmon
Represented By: Richard Elder Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hako-Med Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot Britton Monroe
Represented By: Rudolph Warren Clifford Munnerlyn
Represented By: Brian Michael McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hako-Med USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hako-Med Herstellung + Vertrieb von medizinisch-technischen Geraten GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?