Reynolds v. Dept/Transportation, et al

Plaintiff: Johnny Reynolds
Defendant: Department of Transportation, State of Alabama, Department of Personnel, State of Alabama, Thomas G. Flowers, Robert Renfroe Riley, Joseph McInnes and Anne Regina Yuengert
Intervenor_plaintiff: Cecil Parker, Robert Johnson, Frank Reed, Ouida Maxwell, Martha Ann Boleware, Florence Belser, Peggy Vonsherie Allen, Jeffery W. Brown, William Adams, Cheryl Caine, Tim Colquitt, William Flowers, Wilson Folmar, George Kyser, Becky Pollard, Ronnie Pouncey, Terry Robinson, Tim Williams, Michael Grant, John D'Arville and Andrew McCullough
Special_master: Laurie Edelstein and Carlos Gonzalez
Amicus: The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Movant: Robert Camp, John Robbins, Lieutenant Dukes, Jr., Elaine M. Coley, Shirley Mays, Rosalyn Cook-Deyampert, Robert L. Wiggins, Jr., Gordon, Silberman, Wiggins and Childs, Calvin Lamar, Mary Lamar, Gloria Pugh, Timothy D. Pope, Jonathan H. Waller, Balch and Bingham LLP, Capell and Howard PC, Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., Campbell, Waller & Poer, LLC, Bradley, Arant, Rose, & White, Hand Arendall, L.L.C., Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC, Nettles Hart Hess & Hughes, P.C., Rushton, Stakely, Johnston & Garrett, P.A. and Thomas, Means, Gillis & Seay, P.C.
Case Number: 2:1985cv00665
Filed: March 4, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2015 9140 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT directing that the individual contempt claims ( 1921 , 1922 , 1923 , 1924 , 1925 , 1926 , 1927 , 1928 , 1929 , and 1930 ) of Marvin Adams, Sandy Bell, Willie Coon, Christopher Delaine, Bruce Hicks, Ray Jones, Roy McClain, Lee Ross, Barry Walker, and Milton Williams are dismissed with prejudice, as further set out in judgment. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/23/15. (djy, )
November 20, 2014 9081 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the defendants; 8973 Motion for Order on the pending motion for refund of contempt fines is granted; (2) the defendants' 8751 Motion for Refund of Contempt Fines and the intervenors' 8830 Cross-Motion for Order Confirming That Fine Funds shall Be Used For Compensating Victims of Defendants' Contempt are denied without prejudice subject to being refiled. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/20/14. (djy, )
August 8, 2012 8897 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, with regards to the re 8751 and 8830 MOTIONS re Refund and use of Contempt Fines, directing as follows: (1) the defendants are allowed until 8/15/2012 to submit a more concrete proposal for use of the contempt fines; (2) the parties are allowed a reasonable period of time to attempt to resolve the issues raised by the motions; the special master is to inform the court when the motions are ready to be addressed by the court, should the parties be unable to resolve them. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/8/12. (djy, )
July 30, 2012 8884 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 8751 and 8830 motions for refund and use of contempt fines are set for on-the-record oral argument on August 7, 2012, at 10:00 a.m.; that counsel for defendants are to arrange for the argument to be conducted by telephone. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/30/2012. (cc, )
June 15, 2012 8865 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that in accordance with 8862 stipulation of dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that claimant Samuel Poole's 6492 individual contempt claims are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs; that the clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/15/2012. (cc, )
December 5, 2011 8749 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 12/22/2011, the special master shall file a report, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/5/11. (djy, )
August 31, 2009 8495 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master that defendants' 8432 motion for application of judicial estoppel to the individual contempt claim of Leroy Williams be GRANTED and that Mr. Williams not be permitted to pursue his individual contempt claim ; Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2009. Signed by Special Master C.A. Gonzalez on 8/31/09. (djy, )
July 6, 2009 8442 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the plfs' 8440 MOTION to vacate the court's order and judgment is granted; (2) the order entered on 7/2/09 8437 is VACATED; (3) the special master's 8406 recommendation is set for submission on 7/8/09, with any objections due by that date. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 7/6/09. (djy, )
June 18, 2009 8425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1) The Adams intervenors' objections (doc. no. 8408 are overruled; 2) The plaintiffs' objections (doc. no. 8409 are overruled; 3) ADOPTING 8399 Report and Recommendations; 4) Granting in part and denying in part 8372 defendants' motion for partial summary judgment on intervenors' individual contempt claims as set forth in the recommendation (doc. no. 8399 ).. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 6/18/09. (vma, )
May 1, 2009 8399 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS it is recommended that the Defendants' 8372 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Department of Transportation, State of Alabama, Department of Personnel, State of Alabama be granted in part and denied in part in conformity with this Report and Recommendation; Objections to R&R due by 5/27/2009. Signed by Honorable C.A. Gonzalez, Special Master on 5/1/09. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Dept/Transportation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Reynolds
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Cecil Parker
Represented By: Rebecca J. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Represented By: Rebecca J. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Frank Reed
Represented By: Rebecca J. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Ouida Maxwell
Represented By: Rebecca J. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Martha Ann Boleware
Represented By: Rebecca J. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Florence Belser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Peggy Vonsherie Allen
Represented By: Rebecca J. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Jeffery W. Brown
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: William Adams
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Cheryl Caine
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Tim Colquitt
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: William Flowers
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Wilson Folmar
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: George Kyser
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Becky Pollard
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Ronnie Pouncey
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Terry Robinson
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Tim Williams
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Michael Grant
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: John D'Arville
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Andrew McCullough
Represented By: Raymond Paul Fitzpatrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation, State of Alabama
Represented By: Robert Richardson Baugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Personnel, State of Alabama
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas G. Flowers
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Renfroe Riley
Represented By: Robert Richardson Baugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McInnes
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Regina Yuengert
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Laurie Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Carlos Gonzalez
Represented By: Carlos A. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: Barbara R. Arnwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Robert Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: John Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lieutenant Dukes, Jr.
Represented By: Chuck Hunter(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Elaine M. Coley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Shirley Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Rosalyn Cook-Deyampert
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Robert L. Wiggins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Gordon, Silberman, Wiggins and Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Calvin Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Mary Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Gloria Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Timothy D. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Jonathan H. Waller
Represented By: Brandy Murphy Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Balch and Bingham LLP
Represented By: David R. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Capell and Howard PC
Represented By: Mai Lan Fogal Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz
Represented By: Lisa Wright Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Sirote & Permutt, P.C.
Represented By: David Roy Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Campbell, Waller & Poer, LLC
Represented By: Brandy Murphy Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Bradley, Arant, Rose, & White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Hand Arendall, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC
Represented By: Allen Robert Trippeer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Nettles Hart Hess & Hughes, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Rushton, Stakely, Johnston & Garrett, P.A.
Represented By: Robert A. Huffaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Thomas, Means, Gillis & Seay, P.C.
Represented By: Kenneth Lamar Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?