Johnson v. Wright, et al.

Case Number: 2:2004cv00117
Filed: February 11, 2004
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2005 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Clanton as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/7/05. (Attachments: # 1 appeals checklist)(vmc, )
June 6, 2005 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgmentfiled by Mark Bass, Joe Monroe, Motions for summary judgment due by 6/7/2005. Response to Motion due by 6/27/2005. Reply Brief due by 7/5/2005. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/6/05. (ajr, )
June 1, 2005 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for plaintiffs TO SHOW CAUSE as to why 111 Motion for Extension of Time to File filed by Mark Bass, Joe Monroe, should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2005. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/1/05. (ajr, )
May 26, 2005 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 75 motion to dismiss; dismissing without prejudice all claims against the Chilton County Commission and terminating the Chilton County Commission as a party to this action; denying as moot 73 motion for judgment on the pleadings; furnished to KG, YG, HC Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/26/05. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(ajr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wright, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?