Piland v. Mosley et al (INMATE2)

Case Number: 2:2006cv00046
Filed: January 18, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2007 34 FINAL JUDGMENT that judgment be and is hereby entered in favor of thedefendants and against the plaintiff, and that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk of the court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/24/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cb, )
October 24, 2007 33 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and that this case be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failures to prosecute this action and comply with the orders of this court. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/24/2007. (cb, )
October 16, 2007 No Objections filed to 32 Report and Recommendation. (cb, )
September 28, 2007 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute this action and to comply with the Orders of this court. Objections due on or before 10/10/07. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/28/2007. (cb, ) Modified on 10/16/2007 to add the objection date (cb, ).
September 13, 2007 31 Featured Case ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff show cause on or before 9/24/2007 why his 1 complaint should not be dismissed as further set out; and (2) The Clerk is directed to SEND a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his last known address. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/13/2007. (cb, )
January 5, 2007 Due to the retirement of Judge Delores R. Boyd this case has been reassigned to Judge Terry F. Moorer as referral judge.(cc, )
September 13, 2006 30 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lester Mark Piland.(wcl, )
August 3, 2006 Filing fee: $ 1.00, receipt number 145657 (cb, )
June 2, 2006 29 Plaintiff's Motion In Opposition to 17 Special Report (Summary Judgment) filed by Lester Mark Piland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Piland# 2 Exhibit B-Sworn Statement of Inmates# 3 K. Wilson's Progress Notes# 4 ExhibitBB-PHS Sick Call Slip# 5 Exhibit CC-Physicans Orders# 6 Exhibit DD-Progress Notes Mental Health# 7 Exhibit EE-Psychotropic Medication Report# 8 Mental Health Progress Notes)(cb, )
May 12, 2006 28 Featured Case ORDER denying 27 Motion to Amend complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 5/12/06. (djy, )
May 10, 2006 27 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint by Lester Mark Piland. (cb, )
April 26, 2006 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion to Strike; The Clerk is directed to remove from the docket Exhibits 1,2,4, and 5 as filed with doc.no. 12 . Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 4/26/06. (vma, )
April 25, 2006 25 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 23 Motion for Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 4/25/2006. (ag, )
April 25, 2006 24 MOTION to Strike by Prison Health Services, Inc., Dr. Darbouse, K. Wilson. (Garrett, Richard)
April 21, 2006 23 MOTION for Production of Documents by Lester Mark Piland. (ag, )
April 10, 2006 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Deadline ; that plaintiff is Granted an extension from April 18, 2006 to June 1, 2006 to file his response to Defenants' written reports. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 4/10/2006. (ag, )
April 6, 2006 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Lester Mark Piland. (ag, )
March 28, 2006 20 Featured Case ORDER that on or before April 17, 2006 Plaintiff shall file a response to the written reports. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 3/28/2006. (ag, )
March 28, 2006 19 Featured Case ORDER denying 18 Motion for Injunction/Restraining Order ; referring this case back to Magistrate Judge Delores R. Boyd for action or recommendation on all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/28/2006. (ag, )
March 27, 2006 18 MOTION for Injunction/Restraining Order by Lester Mark Piland. (ag, )
March 23, 2006 17 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Gwendolyn Mosley, Sandra Hayes, Kathy Holt. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Affidavit # 3 Affidavit)(Biggs, Gregory)
March 15, 2006 16 Featured Case ORDER overruling 15 Objection ; that this case is hereby Referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate action or recommendation on all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/15/2006. (ag, )
March 10, 2006 15 Objection to re 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer filed by Lester Mark Piland. (ag, )
March 9, 2006 14 NOTICE of Correction re 12 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint,, 13 Answer to Complaint to enter the corrected pdf into the record. The original pdfs did not contain a signed Certificate of Service page. The corrected pdfs are attached to this notice. (Attachments: # 1 Answer# 2 Special Report)(sl, )
March 7, 2006 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Prison Health Services, Inc., Dr. Darbouse, K. Wilson (ag, )
March 6, 2006 ***Attorney Lewis Peyton Chapman, III and Richard Brett Garrett for Prison Health Services, Inc., Kay Wilson and Dr. Darbouse added per Document 12 . (ag, )
March 6, 2006 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Prison Health Services, Inc., Dr. Darbouse, K. Wilson.(Garrett, Richard)
March 6, 2006 12 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Prison Health Services, Inc., Dr. Darbouse, K. Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 (STRICKEN) Exhibit Medical Records# 2 (STRICKEN) Exhibit Medical Records# 3 Exhibit Medical Records# 4 (STRICKEN) Exhibit Medical Records# 5 (STRICKEN) Exhibit Medical Records# 6 Affidavit Affidavit# 7 Affidavit Affidavit)(Garrett, Richard) Modified on 4/26/2006 - STRIKING EXHIBITS 1, 2, 4 and 5 - per order of 4/26/06 - doc. 26 (vma, ).
March 1, 2006 11 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer ; Special Report & Answer due from Gwendolyn Mosley and Kathy Holt on 4/7/2006. . Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 3/1/2006. (ag, )
March 1, 2006 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by Gwendolyn Mosley, Kathy Holt. (Biggs, Gregory)
January 31, 2006 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order signed by Sharon Blakeley for Dr. Darbouse served on 1/30/2006, answer due 3/6/2006. (ajr, )
January 30, 2006 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order signed by R. Illegible for Prison Health Services, Inc. served on 1/26/2006, answer due 3/2/2006; signed by Katrina Payne for Kathy Holt served on 1/26/2006, answer due 3/2/2006. (ajr, )
January 27, 2006 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order signed by Sharon Blakley for Gwendolyn Mosley served on 1/26/2006, answer due 3/2/2006; K. Wilson served on 1/26/2006, answer due 3/2/2006. (ajr, )
January 26, 2006 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order of procedure signed by Sharon Blakley for Sandra Hayes served on 1/26/2006, answer due 3/6/2006. (ajr, )
January 23, 2006 5 Featured Case ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 40 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants, to the GC for the ADOC, to the AG/State of AL, and to counsel for Prison Health Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 1/23/06. (vma, )
January 23, 2006 4 NOTICE of Correction attaching corrected PDF re 3 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, (Attachments: # 1 corrected PDF)(vma, )
January 23, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full as further set out in order; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Easterling Corr Fac; (furn: cashier). Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 1/23/06. (vma, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2006 (vma, ).
January 18, 2006 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Lester Mark Piland. (ajr, )
January 18, 2006 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against all defendants , filed by Lester Mark Piland.(ajr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piland v. Mosley et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?