Edwards v. Mitchem et al (INMATE1)

Case Number: 2:2006cv00177
Filed: February 27, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 46 Report and Recommendation is adopted and that: 1) Dft Edwards' 1 Petition for Habeas Corpus is DENIED; 2) This case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 42 USC 1997e(c)(1) because Mr. Edwards is not entitled to relief on his claim of actual innocence and the remainder of his claims are procedurally defaulted; An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/4/2008. (wcl, )
October 16, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the petition for habeas corpus relief filed by Robert Rex Edwards be denied and that this case be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2008. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/16/2008. (cb, )
March 20, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion for TRO ; referring this case to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/20. (ag, )
March 14, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER treating the 2 Motion for TRO and Injunction solely as a motion for temporary restraining order; directing that (1) the 2 Motion for TRO and Injunction is DENIED; (2) referring this case to the Mag Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/14/06. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist; # 2 PLRA Notice) (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Mitchem et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?