Parris v. Quattlebaum et al (INMATE1)

Case Number: 2:2006cv00303
Filed: April 5, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling plaintiff's 34 objection; adopting 33 Report and Recommendations; granting defendants' motions for summary judgment; dismissing this case with prejudice; that each party shall bear responsibility for their respective costs. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/17/2009. (cc, )
February 20, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that defendants' 9 , 11 , 15 and 21 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment be granted; that Judgment be granted in favor of the defendants; that this case be dismissed with prejudice; that each party shall bear responsibility for their respective costs; Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/20/2009. (cc, )
April 12, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $ 24.46 be paid on or before April 25, 2006 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Limestone Correctional Facility. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/12/2006. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parris v. Quattlebaum et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?