Cooper v. Nichols, et al (INMATE2) CANNOT ACCEPT PLEADINGS WITHOUT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE

Case Number: 2:2006cv00418
Filed: May 9, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2008 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff's objections to order (doc. no. 131 ) is overruled. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/7/08. (vma, )
May 30, 2006 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Report and Recommendations, it is Ordered that: 1) Plaintiff's claims concerning access to the courts, taser guns, and respondeat superior are dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to directives of 28 U SC 1915(e) (2)(B); 2) Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants Marshall and "law library clerk" are dismissed prior to service: 3) Defendants Marshall and "law library clerk" are dismissed as defendants to this complaint 4) T his case will respect to Plaintiff's allegation or inadequate medical care against Defendant Miller is referred back to the Mag Judge for further proceedings . Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/30/06. (Attachments: # 1 appeals checklist)(vma, )
May 19, 2006 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel . Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 5/19/06. (djy, )
May 12, 2006 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by David Cooper, it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that: 1) Plaintiff's claims concerning access to the courts, taser guns, and respondeat superior, be dismissed with prejudic e prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B); 2) Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants Marshal and "law library clerk" be dismissed prior to service; 3) Dfts Marshall and "law library clerk&q uot; be dismissed as dfts to this complaint; 4) This case with respect to Plaintiff's allegation of inadequate medical care against Dft Miller be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 5/24/2006. Signed by Judge Delores R. Boyd on 5/12/06. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Nichols, et al (INMATE2) CANNOT ACCEPT PLEADINGS WITHOUT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?