Calhoun v. Central Review Board, Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)

Case Number: 2:2006cv00613
Filed: July 13, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling plaintiff's 41 objection; adopting 40 Report and Recommendations; granting defendants' 25 for Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing this case with prejudice; taxing costs of this proceeding against the plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/16/2009. (cc, )
February 20, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that defendants' 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted; that Judgment be entered in favor of the defendants; that the costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff ; that this case be dismissed with prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/20/2009. (cc, )
August 2, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Pine Prairie Correctional Center. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/2/06. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Central Review Board, Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?