Anderson v. Whaley et al (INMATE 1)

Case Number: 2:2006cv00620
Filed: July 17, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: (1) the 19 Recommendation is adopted; (2) defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted; (3) this case is dismissed with prejudice; (4) the costs of this proceeding shall be taxed against the plaintiff. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 9/3/09. (sl, )
August 12, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the defendants' motion for summary judgment be granted; (2) judgment be granted in favor of the defendants; (3) this case be dismissed with prejudice; (4) the costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff. Objections to R&R due by 8/25/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 8/12/09. (sl, )
July 20, 2006 4 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the plaintiff's claims against the State of Alabama be dismissed with prejudice as further set out; (2) the 1983 claims presented against Paul Whaley, Mike Slatton and A. Coleman be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2006. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/20/06. (sl, )
July 19, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and Bullock County Correctional Facility account clerk . Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/19/06. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Whaley et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?