Dunklin v. Riley et al (INMATE1) FILE NO DISCOVERY

Case Number: 2:2006cv01063
Filed: November 29, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Willie Earl Dunklin that: 1. The defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED. 2. Judgment be GRANTED in favor of the defendants. 3. This case be dismissed with prejudice. 4. The costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff. Objections to R&R due by 10/21/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/8/2009. (dmn)
December 13, 2006 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Willie Earl Dunklin be denied; that this case be referred back to the magistrate judge for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 12/27/2007. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/13/2006. (cc, ) Modified on 12/13/2006 to reflect that a copy of this document was mailed to General Counsel for DOC (cc, ).
December 5, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling CF. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/5/2006. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunklin v. Riley et al (INMATE1) FILE NO DISCOVERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?