Casey v. Giles et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Robert Jamar Casey
Defendant: J. C. Giles, Roosevelt Brown and Ammie Screws
Case Number: 2:2007cv00067
Filed: January 22, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plf to comply with the orders of this court and his failure to properly prosecute this action; Objections to R&R due by 4/9/2007. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/27/2007. (wcl, )
March 15, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court [VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER ENTERED ON 3/16/07] ORDERED as follows: (1) The 7 Recommendation is ADOPTED; and (2) This case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of the plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee and his failure to file an amended complaint as ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Ira De Ment on 3/15/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cb, ) Modified on 3/16/2007 (sl, ).
January 25, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert Jamar Casey, it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that: 1) The motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff be denied; 2)This case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2007. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/25/07. (vma, )
January 24, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION on MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $2.24 be paid on or before 2/8/07 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave t o Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Ventress Correctional Facility . Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/24/2007. (cb, ) Modified on 1/24/2007 to correct title of pleading(cb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey v. Giles et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammie Screws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jamar Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?