McGee v. Prison Health Services, Inc. et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Wylie McGee
Defendant: Prison Health Services, Inc., Michael E. Robbins, B. Adams, Linda Lawrence and Richard Allen
Case Number: 2:2007cv00181
Filed: March 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and it is the ORDER of this court that Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED; and this case be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Judge W. Harold Albritton III on 3/20/2007. (dmn)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that plaintiff's 7 MOTION to Dismiss be granted and this case dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/2/2007. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/19/07. (sl, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wylie McGee be denied; that this case be referred back to the magistrate judge for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 3/14/2007. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/2/2007. (cc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Prison Health Services, Inc. et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wylie McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?