Grice v. Blanco et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Ricky L. Grice
Defendant: Kathleen Babineaux Blanco, Pat Le Blanc, Bob Riley and Richard Allen
Case Number: 2:2007cv00189
Filed: March 2, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Amend Complaint; that the style of this case and all future documents shall henceforth refer to defendant Blanco as Kathleen Blanco; that all previous orders and recommendations entered in this case shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/9/2007. (cc, )
March 7, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that plaintiff's claims against defendant Riley be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that plaintiff's claims with respect to his transfer to the Southeast C orrectional Center be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii); that Bob Riley and Richard Allen be dismissed as defendants in this cause of action; that plaintiff's s tate law claims be dismissed without prejudice; that this case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims challenging the conditions ofconfinement at the Southeast Correctional Center in Basile, Louisiana be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1404. Objections to R&R due by 3/20/2007. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/7/2007. (cc, )
March 6, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel . Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/6/2007. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grice v. Blanco et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky L. Grice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Babineaux Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Le Blanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?