Hope v. Allen et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Larrie Hope
Defendant: Captain Bolling, Richard Allen, Warden Rowell, Captain Barrett, Lt. Clay, Allen Smith, Officer Pettway, Officer Barber, Officer Denkins and Ms. Baggett
Case Number: 2:2007cv00210
Filed: March 9, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) the 48 Supplemental Recommendation adopted; (2) the 17 motion for summary judgment is granted as to the classification-level claim asserted against defendant Angie Baggett; (3) summary judgment is entered in favor of defendant Baggett and against plaintiff Larrie Hope on his claim against defendant Baggett, with plaintiff Hope taking nothing as to this claim. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 7/2/09. (sl, )
June 16, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the plaintiff's claim challenging the classification level assigned to him during his confinement at the Kilby Correctional Facility be dismissed with prejudice; (2) the motion for summary judgment filed on behalf of defendant Angie Baggett be granted. Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/16/09. (sl, )
May 22, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the 17 Motion for summary judgment filed on behalf of defendants Richard Allen, W. G. Rowell, Leon Bolling, Bobby Barrett, Carl Clay and Allan D. Smith be granted; (2) the claims brought against defe ndants Allen, Rowell, Bolling, Barrett, Clay and Smith be dismissed with prejudice; (3) defendants Allen, Rowell, Bolling, Barrett, Clay and Smith be dismissed as parties to this cause of action; (4) the motion for summary judgment as to the claims f or monetary damages against defendants Roosevelt Pettaway, Anthony Barber and Tericus Dinkins in their official capacities be granted and such claims dismissed with prejudice; (5) the motion for summary judgment with respect to the plaintiff's e xcessive force claim against defendants Pettaway, Barber and Dinkins in their individual capacities be denied; (6) the plaintiff's excessive force claim against defendants Pettaway, Barber and Dinkins in their individual capacities be set for a jury trial before the district judge assigned in this case. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/22/09. (sl, )
March 15, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the 1 motion for preliminary injunction be denied; (2) this case be referred back t the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 3/28/2007. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/15/07. (sl, )
March 9, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and Kilby Correctional Facility inmate account clerk. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/9/07. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hope v. Allen et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Bolling
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Rowell
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Barrett
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Clay
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Smith
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Pettway
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Barber
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Denkins
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Baggett
Represented By: Ellen Ruth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larrie Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?