Hill v. Alabama Department of Corrections (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Bruce Lamar Hill
Defendant: Officer Barnes, Captain Barrett, Linda Bell, Captain Bolling, Officer Hall, Officer Harris, William Jackson, Officer McCray, Prison Health Services, Officer Rowe, Warden Deputy Rowell, Allen Smith and Sgt. Streeter
Case Number: 2:2007cv00266
Filed: March 28, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 170 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted and that the Defendants' 30 , 40 , 52 , and 75 , Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice,with costs taxed against Plaintiff for which let execution issue. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 5/19/2009. (cb, )
April 28, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) The defendants Motions for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; (2) Judgment be GRANTED in favor of the defendants; (3) This case be dismissed with prejudice; and (4) The costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff. Objections to R&R due by 5/11/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/28/2009. (cb, )
April 5, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION ON MOTION directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 7 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 4/5/2007. (cb, )
March 28, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that: (1) the MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED; (2) this case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 4/10/2007. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 3/28/07. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Alabama Department of Corrections (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lamar Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Barnes
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Barrett
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Bell
Represented By: Paul McGee James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Bolling
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hall
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Harris
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jackson
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer McCray
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services
Represented By: Paul McGee James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rowe
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Deputy Rowell
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Smith
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Streeter
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?