Tate v. Bass et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Marcus Orlando Tate
Defendant: Marc Bass, Marc A. Starrett, Troy King, Robert Bobby Keahey, Thomas Baxter and Spencer Walker
Case Number: 2:2007cv00292
Filed: April 6, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Escambia
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2007 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that no motions directed to the claims presented in the complaint be filed without permission of this court. If any pleading denominated as a dispositive motion or motion for preliminary injunction is sent to this court without the requisite permission, the Clerk is directed not to file or docket the motion and shall return such document to the plaintiff. The plaintiff is advised that he should not seek any further relief from this court as this case is due to be transferred to the Uni ted States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama for review and disposition. Thus, any requests for relief should be submitted to the U. S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama upon transfer of this case to that court. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/18/07. (sl, )
April 16, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/16/2007. (dmn)
April 12, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Marcus Orlando Tate, that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1404. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2007. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/12/2007. (dmn)
April 10, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/10/2007. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate v. Bass et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Orlando Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc A. Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bobby Keahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?