Martin v. State of Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Joe Benoit Martin
Defendant: Edward Robinson, Leon Forniss, Richard Allen, Billy Pittman, M. Sanford and W. Copeland
Case Number: 2:2007cv00335
Filed: April 19, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that: 1) re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Billy Pittman, W. Copeland, Richard Allen, M. Sanford, Leon Forniss, Edward Robinson be granted; 2) Judgment be granted in favor of the defendants; 3) This case be dismissed with prejudice; 4) The costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff; Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/19/09. (vma, )
May 1, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that: (1) the claims Martin presents against the State of Alabama Dept of Corrections be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance wtih the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); (2 ) the State of Alabama Dept of Corrections be dismissed from this cause of action; (3) this case, with respect to the claims lodged against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 5/14/2007. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 5/1/07. (djy, )
April 19, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $10.00 be paid on or before 5/18/07 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Staton Correctional Facility. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 4/19/07. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. State of Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Robinson
Represented By: Neal P. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Forniss
Represented By: Neal P. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Represented By: Neal P. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Pittman
Represented By: Neal P. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sanford
Represented By: Neal P. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Copeland
Represented By: Neal P. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Benoit Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?