Dean v. Department of Corrections et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dean
Defendant: Richard Allen, J. C. Giles, B. Luke, Prison Health Services and Sgt. Longmire
Case Number: 2:2007cv00342
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) The 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED; (2) Defendants Allen, Giles, and Longmire's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 27 , 40 ) is GRANTED; (3) Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. 1 ) against Defendants Allen, Giles, and Longmi re is DISMISSED with prejudice; (4) Defendants PHS, Inc., and Liebe's (identified in the complaint as "B. Luke") motion for summary judgment (Doc. 28 ) is GRANTED to the extent it seeks dismissal of the case due to Plaintiff's fa ilure to properly exhaust his administrative remedies; and (5) The complaint (Doc. 1 ) against Defendants PHS, Inc., and Liebe is DISMISSED with prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to exhaust his administrative remedies in accord with 42 U.S.C. 1997e(a). Final judgment will be separately entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/11/2009. (dmn)
November 19, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that: 1. Defendants Allen, Giles, and Longmier's motion for summary judgment (Doc. Nos. 27, 40) be GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants Allen, Giles, and Longmire be DISMISSED with prejudice; 3. Def endants PHS, Inc., and Liebe's motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 28) be GRANTED to the extent they seek dismissal of this case due to Plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust administrative remedies previously available to him at the Ven tress Correctional Facility; 4. The complaint against Defendants PHS, Inc., and Liebe be DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) for Plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies available to him during his confinement at the Ventress Correctional Facility; and 5. Judgement be ENTERED in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/19/2009. (dmn)
April 24, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $16.67 be paid on or before 5/14/2007; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Ventress CF. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 4/24/2007. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Department of Corrections et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Luke
Represented By: Paul McGee James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services
Represented By: Paul McGee James, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Longmire
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney C. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?