Greenwood v. Mosley et al (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Demond Greenwood
Defendant: Gwendolyn C Mosley and Troy King
Case Number: 2:2007cv00407
Filed: May 9, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 13 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and Mr. Demond Greenwood's petition for habeas corpus relief filed pursuant to 28 USC 2254 is DISMISSED with prejudice as untimely filed; An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/30/2008. (wcl, )
December 9, 2008 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the petition for habeas corpus relief be dismissed with prejudice as untimely filed. Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 12/9/2008. (cb, )
May 14, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 6/4/2007, Greenwood shall show cause why his federal habeas petition should not be denied as further set out. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/14/2007. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwood v. Mosley et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn C Mosley
Represented By: Yvonne A. H. Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demond Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?