Brown v. Montgomery County Detention Facility (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Roderickus Dequan Brown
Defendant: Montgomery County Detention Facility
Case Number: 2:2007cv00487
Filed: June 4, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2009 13 Partial Filing fee received: $ 3.20, receipt number 4602009030. (wcl, )
January 13, 2009 12 Partial Filing fee received: $ 42.00, receipt number 4602008434. (wcl, )
October 21, 2008 11 Filing fee: $ 76.00, receipt number 4602006822 (cb, )
August 1, 2008 10 Partial Filing fee received: $ 37.00, receipt number 4602005954. (wcl, )
May 27, 2008 9 Partial Filing fee received: $116.00, receipt number 4602005254. (dmn)
January 28, 2008 8 Filing fee: $ 62.80, receipt number 4602003584 (cb, )
September 28, 2007 7 Filing fee: $ 13.00, receipt number 4602000563 (cb, )
July 31, 2007 6 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: 1) Judgment is entered in favor of the defendant and against plaintiff; 2) This action is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/31/2007. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(wcl, )
July 31, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court that: 1) The 4 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) The plf's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process, pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); an appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/31/2007. (wcl, )
July 27, 2007 No objection filed to 4 Report and Recommendations. (cb, )
June 7, 2007 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that Plf's complaint be DISMISSED with prejduice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2007. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 6/7/2007. (cb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2007 (cb, ).
June 7, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at VCF; cashier. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 6/7/07. (vma, )
June 4, 2007 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Roderickus Dequan Brown. (cb, )
June 4, 2007 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Montgomery County Detention Facility , filed by Roderickus Dequan Brown.(cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Montgomery County Detention Facility (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderickus Dequan Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?