Hicks v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Charles Hicks
Defendant: Staton Correctional Facility, Leon Forniss, Richard Allen, Alabama Department of Corrections and Lt. Copeland
Case Number: 2:2007cv00507
Filed: June 8, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 20 Report and Recommendation is adopted and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1997(e)(c)(1). An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 10/21/2008. (cb, )
October 3, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1997e(c)(1). Objections due 10/16/08. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/3/2008. (cb, )
June 12, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that : (1) The plaintiff's claim against the ADOC, Richard Allen, Leon Formiss, and the Staton Correctional Facility be dismissed prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); (2) T he ADOC, Richard Allen, Leon Forniss and the Staton Correctional Facility be dismissed as defendants in this cause of action; and (3) This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claim against Lt. Copeland, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2007. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/12/2007. (cb, )
June 11, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Staton Correctional Facility . Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/11/2007. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staton Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Forniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?