Davis v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Antonio D. Davis
Defendant: Alabama Board of Pardon & Paroles, Richard Allen, Alabama Department of Corrections, Deborah Stutts and Jefferson County Probation and Parole Office
Case Number: 2:2007cv00574
Filed: June 22, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 25 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) The dfts' motions for summary judgment are GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice; 3) The costs of this proceeding are taxed against the plf. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/22/2009. (wcl, )
August 27, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge: 1) The dfts' 9 & 14 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; 2) Judgment be GRANTED in favor of the dfts; 3) This case be dismissed with prejudice; 4) The costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plf; Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/27/2009. (wcl, )
June 26, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $25.67 be paid on or before 7/11/2007; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Draper Correctional Center. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 6/26/2007. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Board of Pardon & Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Stutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Probation and Parole Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?