Ziglar v. United States of America (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Joe Carroll Ziglar
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2007cv00632
Filed: July 11, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Talladega
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Ziglar's 81 motion for relief, as further set out in order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/9/10. (djy, )
September 27, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that on or before October 18, 2010, the petitioner may file a reply to the response filed by the government. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/27/2010. (jg, )
August 25, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before September 24, 2010, the United States shall file a response showing cause why Ziglar's 81 Motion should not be granted, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/25/10. (scn, )
October 22, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: 1. Petitioner's 63 MOTION for Reconsideration filed on 10/20/2009 is DENIED. 2. Petitioner's objections to the Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Doc. 55 and 58 ) are OVERRULED. 3. The 52 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge entered on 8/18/2009 is ADOPTED; 4. The 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion filed by Ziglar is DENIED, as the claims therein entitle him to no relief. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/22/2009. (dmn)
September 22, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court [VACATED PURSUANT TO COURT 59 ORDER ENTERED 10/7/2009.] ORDERED that: (1) the petitioner's 55 objections are overruled; (2) the 52 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (3) the 28 USC 2255 motion is denied as the claims entitled him to no relief. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/22/09. (sl, ) Modified on 10/7/2009 (dmn).
August 18, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Joe Carroll Ziglar be denied, as the claims therein entitle him to no relief. Objections to R&R due by 9/1/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/18/2009. (dmn)
April 1, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 4/10/2009, Petitioner shall file with this court a supplemental pleading that plainly states whether he contends that he specifically requested counsel to file an appeal on his behalf. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/1/2009. (dmn)
March 19, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 4/2/2009, Petitioner shall file with this court a supplemental pleading that plainly states whether he contends that he specifically requested his counsel to file an appeal on his behalf. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/19/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziglar v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tommie Brown Hardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Carroll Ziglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?