McAteer v. Riley et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Roy Lee McAteer
Defendant: Bob Riley, Troy King and Alabama Department of Public Safety
Case Number: 2:2007cv00692
Filed: July 31, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Bibb
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 59 Report and Recommendation. Mr. McAteer's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice, so that his challenges to the Alabama Community Notification Act may proceed before this court in a single cause of action, case number 2:09-CV-361-TMH-SRW. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/11/2010. (dmn)
February 19, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; that this case be dismissed without prejudice allowing all of the plaintiff's challenges to the Alabama Community Notification Act to proceed before this court in a single cause of action. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2010. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/19/2010. (jg, )
August 1, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Bibb County Correctional Facility. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/1/2007. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAteer v. Riley et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Represented By: Joshua Steven Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Represented By: Joshua Steven Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Joshua Steven Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Lee McAteer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?