Williams v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Plaintiff: |
Timothy Williams |
Defendant: |
United States of America |
Case Number: |
2:2007cv00742 |
Filed: |
August 21, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark E. Fuller |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Russ Walker |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Vacate Sentence |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
89
ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: (1) Petitioner's 88 Objection to the Magistrate Judge Recommendation filed on 10/19/2009 is overruled; (2) The 75 Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge entered on 8/18/2009 is adopted; (3) The 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion filed by Williams is DENIED, as the claims therein entitled him to no relief. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/27/2009. (dmn)
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing
87
ORDER that the 84 Motion to Remove Counsel of Record James McCauley Smith is DENIED. This Court does not consider it appropriate to relieve counsel of representation in this matter until after expiration of the time for filing any objections to the 75 Report and Recommendation entered on 8/18/2009. However, Petitioner will also be permitted to file additional timely objections to the Report and Recommendation should he choose to do so. See Doc. 86 . It is further ORDERED that appointed counsel of record James McCauley Smith is to correspond with his client, Petitioner, and file motions as appropriate. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/15/2009. (dmn)
|
October 13, 2009 |
Filing
86
ORDER re Petitioner's 85 Motion for Copy of Records, in which he contends that he has not received a copy of this court's 75 Recommendation entered on 8/18/2009. In the same motion, Petitioner again requests a copy of the transcript of the evidentiary hearing held on 8/3/2009. Petitioner also requests an additional extension of time to file objections to the court's Recommendation. The court having considered Petitioner's motion, the Clerk of the Court is hereby DIRECTED to provide Petitioner with a copy of this court's Recommendation entered on 8/18/2009. It is further ORDERED that: (1) Petitioner's motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioner is hereby GRANTED an extension of time from 10/12/2009, to and including 10/26/2009, to file objections to this court's Recommendation entered on 8/18/2009. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2009. No further extensions will be granted. (2) Petitioner's request for a copy of the transcript of the evidentiary hearing is DENIED for the reasons stated in the previous orders of this court. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 10/13/2009. (dmn)
|
September 30, 2009 |
Filing
83
ORDER: Petitioner's 81 "Motion to Respond to Report and Recommendation" contains a request for a copy of the transcript of the evidentiary hearing held on 8/3/2009. As Petitioner was advised in a previous 78 Order of this court den ying his request for a transcript, no official transcript of the evidentiary hearing has been generated and Petitioner has not set forth a valid basis establishing his need for a transcript of the hearing. ORDERED that Petitioner's request for a copy of the transcript of the evidentiary hearing is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/30/2009. (dmn)
|
September 10, 2009 |
Filing
79
[VACATED PURSUANT TO COURT 82 ORDER ENTERED 9/29/2009.] ORDER ADOPTING 75 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and that the 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Williams is DENIED, as the claims therein entitle him to no relief. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/10/2009. (dmn) Modified on 9/29/2009 (dmn).
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing
78
ORDER that: 1. Petitioner's 77 Motion for an order dismissing James McCauley Smith as his counsel is DENIED at this time; and 2. Petitioner's motion for a copy of a transcript of the evidentiary hearing is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to provide Petitioner with copies of any further pleadings or orders entered in this case. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/27/2009. (dmn)
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing
75
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Timothy Williams be denied, as the claims therein entitle him to no relief. Objections to R&R due by 9/1/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/18/2009. (dmn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?