Norman v. United States of America (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Alphonso Norman
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2007cv00893
Filed: October 4, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on April 5, 2010 (Doc. #38), the petitioner filed a Notice of Appeal which the Court construes to contain a Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 05/20/10. (ydw, )
February 1, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the petitioner's Objection to the Magistrate Judge Recommendation 35 filed on January 5, 2010 is overruled; that the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 25 entered on October 10, 2009 is adopted; that the 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion filed by Norman is DENIED as the claims therein entitled him to no relief. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/1/2010. (jg, )
December 10, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this Court's prior order dated December 10, 2009 31 is VACATED; that 29 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment is GRANTED; that 26 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and 27 Final Judgment entered by this Court on November 16, 200 9 are VACATED; that 30 MOTION for Extension of Time is DENIED as moot; that the plaintiff shall file any objections he may have to 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on or before December 30, 2009. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/10/2009. (cc, )
November 16, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PURSUANT TO 32 ORDER. ORDER adopting 25 Report and Recommendations; that the 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion filed by Norman is DENIED as the claims contained therein entitle him to no relief. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/16/2009. (cc, ) Modified on 12/10/2009 (cc, ).
October 21, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 1 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion filed by Norman be denied, as the claims therein entitle him to no relief; Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 10/21/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: John T. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?