Plump v. Riley (PANEL)

Plaintiff: Fred L. Plump
Defendant: Bob Riley
Case Number: 2:2007cv01014
Filed: November 16, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973(c) Voting Rights -Qualifications & Procedures
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: 1) The 73 Joint Notice of Intent to Settle and Request for Order is GRANTED; 2) The 28 Memorandum Opinion, the 29 Judgment, and the 33 Amended Judgment entered by this Court are VACATED; 3) Plf's 51 Renewed MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses is DENIED as MOOT; 4) The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint stipulation of dismissal by no later than 10/30/2009. Signed by Judge Rosemary Barkett, Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller, Judge W. Harold Albritton on 10/28/2009. (wcl, )(wcl, )
September 10, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the 54 MOTION to Vacate and Dismiss as Moot filed by Bob Riley is GRANTED in part. It is granted with respect to Plaintiff's claims under Section 2 of the Voting Rights Act and the Thirteenth, Fourteenth, and Fifteenth Amendments. Those claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. This Opinion and Order finally resolves the Motion to Vacate and Dismiss as Moot. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/10/2009. (dmn)
January 22, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT of the court that: (1) Declaratory Judgment is entered in favor of Plf Fred L. Plump against Dft Governor Bob Riley; (2) The Dft has 90 days from the date of this order to obtain preclearance in accordance with 5 of the Voting Rights A ct of 1965, as amended, 42 USC 1973c, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP so that appeal may be taken and the case consolidated with Kennedy v. Riley, 07-77, if the US Supreme Court deems consolidation appropriate. Signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/22/2008. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plump v. Riley (PANEL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred L. Plump
Represented By: James U. Blacksher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?