Carey v. Alabama Pardon & Paroles et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Anthony L. Carey
Defendant: Alabama Pardon & Paroles, Bill Wynn, Velinda Weatherly, Robert Longshore, Bob Riley, Troy King and Victims of Crime Against Leniency (VOCAL)
Case Number: 2:2007cv01106
Filed: December 20, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that plaintiff's 107 objections are overruled; that 104 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS is adopted; that defendants' 23 , 25 , 37 , 40 , & 56 motions for summary judgment are granted; that Judgment is entered in favor of defen dants and against plaintiff, with plaintiff taking nothing by his complaint; that costs are taxed against plaintiff, for which execution may issue; that the clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; that this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 2/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, )
October 20, 2008 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT as follows: (1) Plaintiff's 69 Objections are overruled; (2) the 65 Magistrate Judge's Order is AFFIRMED; and (3) This cause is referred back to the magistrate judge for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/20/2008. (cb, )
February 6, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff's 9 Objection is overruled; (2) The 7 Magistrate Judge's Recommendation is ADOPTED;(3) Plaintiff's claims against defendants Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles and Victims of Crime Against Lenien cy are dismissed; (4) Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles and Victims of Crime Against Leniency are dismissed; and (5) This cause in all other respects are referred back to the magistrate judge for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/6/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carey v. Alabama Pardon & Paroles et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Pardon & Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velinda Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Longshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victims of Crime Against Leniency (VOCAL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?